# Mastering Mental Math: Speedy Techniques for Everyday Calculations

Written on

## Chapter 1: The Power of Mental Math

Mental math is a remarkable skill that proves invaluable in both personal and professional contexts. The ability to perform swift and precise calculations in your mind is more attainable than you might think. Here, we explore various tricks and shortcuts to simplify mental arithmetic.

### Section 1.1: Squaring Numbers That End in 5

When squaring two-digit numbers ending in 5, the result will always have 25 as the last two digits. The preceding digits can be determined by multiplying the first digit (n) by (n+1). For example:

**85 x 85**: (8 x 9) gives us 72, combined with 25 yields**7225**.**15 x 15**: (1 x 2) gives us 2, combined with 25 yields**225**.**45 x 45**: (4 x 5) results in 20, combined with 25 gives**2025**.**95 x 95**: (9 x 10) gives us 90, combined with 25 results in**9025**.

This method is specifically applicable to two-digit numbers that end in 5.

### Section 1.2: Multiplication with a Sum of 10

For this trick to work, you need double-digit numbers where the digits on the right sum to 10 and the left digits are identical. The process involves multiplying the right digits and applying the same logic to the left. Consider the following examples:

**73 x 77**: (7 x 8) and (3 x 7) gives us**5621**.**81 x 89**: (8 x 9) and (9 x 1) results in**7209**.**32 x 38**: (3 x 4) and (8 x 2) yields**1216**.

### Section 1.3: Multiplying by 5

This technique is straightforward. To multiply a number by 5, first multiply it by 10, then divide by 2. Here are some examples:

**76 x 5**: 76 x 10 = 760, then 760 / 2 =**380**.**135 x 5**: 135 x 10 = 1350, then 1350 / 2 =**675**.**96 x 5**: 96 x 10 = 960, then 960 / 2 =**480**.

## Chapter 2: Advanced Multiplication Techniques

The first video demonstrates mental math techniques, helping you calculate faster than a calculator.

### Section 2.1: Multiplying by 11

To multiply by 11, simply add the digits of the two-digit number and insert the sum between the original digits. For instance:

**81 x 11**: Add 8 + 1 = 9, place it between 8 and 1 to get**891**.**42 x 11**: Add 4 + 2 = 6, yielding**462**.**87 x 11**: Add 8 + 7 = 15, carry over to get**957**.

### Section 2.2: Multiplying Numbers Near 100

This engaging technique involves multiplying two-digit numbers close to 100. For example, to multiply 89 by 95:

- Determine how far each number is from 100 (11 and 5).
- Subtract from 100 (100 - 11 - 5 = 84).
- Multiply the differences (11 x 5 = 55).
- Combine the results: 8455.

More examples include:

**91 x 96**: (100 - 9 - 4) and (4 x 9) = 8736.**88 x 94**: (100 - 12 - 6) and (12 x 6) = 8272.

### Section 2.3: Multiplying by 101 and 111

For multiplying a two-digit number by 101, simply write the number twice:

**28 x 101**=**2828**.**74 x 101**=**7474**.

When multiplying by 111, add the two digits and place the sum in the middle:

**63 x 111**: 6 + 3 = 9, so the result is**693**.**78 x 111**: 7 + 8 = 15, yielding**8658**.

The second video highlights simple tricks to easily enhance your mental math skills.

## Chapter 3: Additional Techniques and Insights

### Section 3.1: Squaring Two-Digit Numbers

To square a two-digit number, consider an easier number nearby, then multiply and adjust:

For example, squaring 34:

- Identify the nearby number (30) and the difference (4).
- Multiply 30 by 38: 30 x 38 = 1140.
- Add the square of the difference (4² = 16): 1140 + 16 =
**1156**.

Examples include:

**18 x 18**: 20 x 16 = 320 + 4 =**324**.**88 x 88**: 90 x 86 = 7740 + 4 =**7744**.

### Section 3.2: Finding Cube Roots

To find the cube root of a number, drop the last three digits and identify the closest cube. For instance, for 592704, drop the last three (592) to get 8 (as 8³ = 512). The final digit (4) gives us the last digit of the cube root, resulting in **84**.

### Section 3.3: Mastering Percentages

Calculating percentages can be simplified using basic techniques. For example:

- To find
**6% of 2400**:- Determine 1% (2400 / 100 = 24).
- Multiply by 6 (24 x 6 =
**144**).

Likewise, for **4.5% of 1800**:

- Find 1% (1800 / 100 = 18).
- Divide 1% by 2 for 0.5%, then calculate (18 x 4 + 9 =
**81**).

### Section 3.4: The Importance of Fractions

Understanding fractions is crucial in mathematics. Here are some common conversions:

**1/3 = 0.333...****1/5 = 0.20****1/6 = 0.166...**

Memorizing these can greatly speed up calculations.

### Section 3.5: Quick Subtraction from 1000

When subtracting from 1000, a neat trick exists:

For **1000 - 423**:

Subtract the left digits from 9 and the last digit from 10.

- 9 - 4 = 5
- 9 - 2 = 7
- 10 - 3 = 7

Result:

**577**.

In conclusion, mastering these mental math techniques can dramatically improve your calculation speed and efficiency in everyday scenarios.

### One Last Thought

I've recently launched an NFT collection supporting humanitarian and medical initiatives. The Society of Light is a series of limited collectibles designed to contribute a portion of sales to various charities. Here are the benefits of purchasing these NFTs:

**Potential for High Returns**: Proceeds are focused on marketing the collection to boost value in the secondary market.**Art Collection**: Owning these avatars symbolizes good deeds and adds artistic value to your portfolio.**Charitable Contributions**: Flexibly direct funds to your chosen causes.**Free PDF Book**: Each NFT buyer receives a complimentary copy of my latest book.

Click here to support the cause against brain cancer and buy Vakhos.